EP0494352 - Yarn coating applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 100 Cherry Hill Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [1992/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hodan, John A. 4 Glenwood Circle Arden, NC 28704 / US | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119024.7 | 07.11.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | US19910638674 | 08.01.1991 Original published format: US 638674 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494352 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494352 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D06B1/08 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
D06B1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Flüssigkeit auf Textilgarne | [1992/29] | English: | Yarn coating applicator | [1992/29] | French: | Applicateur d'apprêts pour fils | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 12.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.03.1997 | GB | 07.11.1997 | CH | 30.11.1997 | LI | 30.11.1997 | [2002/32] |
Former [1998/50] | GB | 07.11.1997 | |
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 07.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3244142 (WALKER WILLIAM D); | [A]FR1499797 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]US4095558 (ELLEGAST KONRAD, et al) |