EP0490104 - Method of controlling the air admission for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherenberg, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Lauxweg 37 W-7000 Stuttgart 75 / DE | [1992/25] | Application number, filing date | 91119305.0 | 13.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | DE19904039992 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039992 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490104 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490104 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/02 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
F02B27/021 (EP);
F02B27/02 (US);
F02B27/0242 (EP);
F02B27/0252 (EP);
F02B27/0273 (EP);
F02B27/0294 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Luftzufuhr bei einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1992/25] | English: | Method of controlling the air admission for an internal combustion engine | [1992/25] | French: | Procédé pour contrôler l'admission d'air pour moteur à combustion interne | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 28.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62091622 ; | [A]JP60198325 ; | [A]JP58093929 ; | [A]EP0225620 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO8201742 (HORVATH ATTILA J); | [A]WO8903473 (HALL KEITH GORDON [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 301 (M-628)(2748) 30. September 1987 & JP-A-62 091 622 ( NISSAN ) 27. April 1987, & JP62091622 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 47 (M-456)(2104) 25. Februar 1986 & JP-A-60 198 325 ( MAZDA ) 7. Oktober 1985, & JP60198325 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 193 (M-238)(1338) 24. August 1983 & JP-A-58 093 929 ( HINO ) 3. Juni 1983, & JP58093929 A 00000000 | [AD] - MTZ Bd. 51, Nr. 4, 1990, STUTTGART Seiten 142 - 146; MILAN MICIK: 'Der Hochleistungsmotor für BMW M 5' |