EP0486032 - Binding unit for binding sheets in adherence to a binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Satoshi 2-3, Hatcho-nishi 2-chome Imabari-shi, Ehime / JP | 02 /
Nomura, Mitsuo 15-17, Higashiyama 3-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa / JP | 03 /
Arai, Hiroyuki, Raffine Kitazawa 502, 2-3 Higashinakamoto, 3-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Ishii, Yoshifumi, Kitada Haitsu 105, 17-29, Akeminosato-cho Daito-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Ichiro, Moriguchi Sky Haitsu 909, 4-82, Satanaka-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119474.4 | 14.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | JP19900310078 | 14.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31007890 | JP19900310079 | 14.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31007990 | JP19900312101 | 16.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31210190 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486032 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486032 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B42C9/00 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B42C9/0056 (EP,US);
Y10S412/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Binden von Bogen in einem Umschlag | [1992/21] | English: | Binding unit for binding sheets in adherence to a binder | [1992/21] | French: | Dispositif pour relier des feuilles dans une couverture | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4818168 (BATTISTI THOMAS T [US]); | [A]US4129471 (ROME BERNARD) |