EP0486952 - Method for heating and bending a glass sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/22] | Heating apparatus for a glass-sheet bending station | ||
[1995/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamglass Engineering Oy Vehmaistenkatu 5 SF-33730 Tampere / FI | [1993/18] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states TAMGLASS OY Vehmaistenkatu 5 SF-33730 Tampere / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salonen, Tauno Tapio Ylisenkatu 1 B 15 SF-33710 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Yli-Vakkuri, Erkki Paavo Johannes Helakallionkatu 34 SF-33580 Tampere / FI | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119477.7 | 14.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | FI19900005695 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: FI 905695 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0486952 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0486952 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486952 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03B29/08, C03B23/023 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
C03B29/08 (EP,US);
C03B23/0235 (EP,US);
Y10S65/04 (EP);
Y10S65/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhitzen und Biegen einer Glasscheibe | [1995/42] | English: | Method for heating and bending a glass sheet | [1995/42] | French: | Procédé de chauffage et bombage d'une feuille de verre | [1995/42] |
Former [1992/22] | Heizungsvorrichtung für eine Glasscheibenbiegezelle | ||
Former [1992/22] | Heating apparatus for a glass-sheet bending station | ||
Former [1992/22] | Appareil de chauffage pour une station de bombage d'une feuille de verre | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0443948 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | [XP]EP0443947 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | [X]EP0241356 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | [X]EP0376509 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al); | [X]US4952227 (HERRINGTON RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US4957532 (JACOBSON DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US4528016 (CANFIELD DOUGLAS M [US], et al); | [A]EP0078135 (MCMASTER HAROLD); | [A]US3744985 (PETERNEL J); | [A]US4807144 (JOEHLIN STANLEY W [US], et al) |