EP0488129 - Image sensor and information processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizuka, Haruo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120087.1 | 25.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900324562 | 26.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32456290 | JP19910055615 | 28.02.1991 Original published format: JP 5561591 | JP19910169134 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16913491 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488129 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488129 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488129 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/028 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
H04N1/00976 (EP);
H04N1/02865 (EP);
H04N1/0312 (EP);
H04N1/0315 (EP);
H04N1/0318 (EP);
H04N2201/02404 (EP);
H04N2201/02431 (EP);
H04N2201/02441 (EP);
H04N2201/02452 (EP);
H04N2201/02456 (EP);
H04N2201/02462 (EP);
H04N2201/02468 (EP);
H04N2201/02474 (EP);
H04N2201/02481 (EP);
H04N2201/02483 (EP);
H04N2201/03112 (EP);
H04N2201/03116 (EP);
H04N2201/03129 (EP);
H04N2201/03141 (EP);
H04N2201/03145 (EP);
H04N2201/0315 (EP);
H04N2201/03158 (EP);
H04N2201/03162 (EP);
H04N2201/0317 (EP);
H04N2201/04796 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H04N2201/02431, H04N2201/02441, H04N2201/04796 (EP);
H04N2201/02456, H04N2201/02474, H04N2201/02483 (EP);
H04N2201/02462, H04N2201/02468, H04N2201/02481 (EP);
H04N2201/03112, H04N2201/03116, H04N2201/03129, H04N2201/03141, H04N2201/03145 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Bildsensor und Informationsverarbeitungsgerät | [1992/23] | English: | Image sensor and information processing apparatus | [1992/23] | French: | Capteur d'images et appareil de traitement d'informations | [1992/23] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1998/45: (deleted) | EPB 1996/16: Teilanmeldung 96100186.4 eingereicht am 08/01/96 | EPB 1996/16: Divisional application 96100186.4 filed on 08/01/96 | EPB 1996/16: Demande divisionnaire 96100186.4 déposée le 08/01/96 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96100186.4 / EP0716535 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57101468 ; | [A]JP01216666 ; | [A]JP02268563 ; | [A]JP62123865 ; | [Y]JP02022872 ; | [A]JP63182958 ; | [A]JP62248365 ; | [X]JP01125168 ; | [Y]JP61278265 ; | [Y]JP60124167 ; | [A]JP61253588 ; | [A]JP63026067 ; | [A]JP60218966 ; | [A]US4873579 (KUBOTA TOORU [JP], et al); | [Y]US4783700 (NAGANE HIROMICHI [JP]); | [A]EP0294834 (CANON KK [JP]) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES vol. 37, no. 5, 1 May 1990, NEW YORK, US pages 1271 - 1279 MASAHIRO HAYAMA 'Characteristics of p-i Junctions Amorphous Silicon Stripe-Type Photodiode Array and its Application to Contact Image Sensor' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 189 (E-133)28 September 1982 & JP-A-57 101 468 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 24 June 1982, & JP57101468 A 19820624 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 531 (E-851)28 November 1989 & JP-A-01 216 666 ( SEIKO EPSON CORP. ) 30 August 1989, & JP01216666 A 19890830 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 22 (E-1024)18 January 1991 & JP-A-02 268 563 ( KONICA CORP. ) 2 November 1990, & JP02268563 A 19901102 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 343 (E-555)10 November 1987 & JP-A-62 123 865 ( TOSHIBA CORP. ) 5 June 1987, & JP62123865 A 19870605 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 166 (E-911)30 March 1990 & JP-A-02 022 872 ( KONICA CORP. ) 25 January 1990, & JP02022872 A 19900125 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 457 (E-688)30 November 1988 & JP-A-63 182 958 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD. ) 28 July 1988, & JP63182958 A 19880728 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 124 (E-601)16 April 1988 & JP-A-62 248 365 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD. ) 29 October 1987, & JP62248365 A 19871029 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 371 (E-807)17 August 1989 & JP-A-01 125 168 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD. ) 17 May 1989, & JP01125168 A 19890517 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 138 (E-503)2 May 1987 & JP-A-61 278 265 ( FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. ) 9 December 1986, & JP61278265 A 19861209 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 280 (E-356)8 November 1985 & JP-A-60 124 167 ( CANON K.K. ) 3 July 1985, & JP60124167 A 19850703 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 103 (P-562)2 April 1987 & JP-A-61 253 588 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 11 November 1986, & JP61253588 A 19861111 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 234 (E-629)5 July 1988 & JP-A-63 026 067 ( SEIKO INSTR. & ELECTRONICS LTD. ) 3 February 1988, & JP63026067 A 19880203 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 069 (E-389)18 March 1986 & JP-A-60 218 966 ( CANON K.K. ) 1 November 1985, & JP60218966 A 19851101 |