EP0488185 - Throwaway insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tatsuo, Arai, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1511, Ooaza Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Takayoshi, Saito, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1511, Ooaza Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120206.7 | 26.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900124002 | 26.11.1990 Original published format: JP 12400290 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488185 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488185 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
B23C5/2213 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/2269 (KR);
B23C2200/0416 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/201 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S408/713 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | Wegwerfschneideinsatz | [1992/23] | English: | Throwaway insert | [1992/23] | French: | Plaquette de coupe à jeter | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 03.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.08.1994 | SE | 10.11.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 10.08.1994 | |
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 10.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2336598 (KYSOR INDUSTRIAL CORP); | [A]EP0104517 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0334129 (GTE VALENITE CORP [US]) |