EP0488263 - Polyester resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Naoki, c/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 02 /
Nakata, Akira, c/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 03 /
Koshirai, Atsunori, c/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 04 /
Yanagase, Akira, c/o Central Research Lab. Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyuki-cho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/23] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120353.7 | 28.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900322680 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32268090 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488263 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488263 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488263 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08K5/54, // (C08L67/02, 51:08) | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L51/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/23] | Title | German: | Polyesterharzzusammensetzungen | [1992/23] | English: | Polyester resin compositions | [1992/23] | French: | Compositions de résine de polyester | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/06] | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.02.1998 | [1998/49] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0308871 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [YD]EP0393616 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |