EP0490197 - Azulensquaric acid dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Michael, Dr. Freudenbergstrasse 18 W-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Albert, Bernhard, Dr. Rietburgstrasse 13 W-6701 Maxdorf / DE | 03 /
Brosius, Sibylle, Dr. Cordovastrasse 29 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Schomann, Klaus Dieter, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 47 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
Kuppelmaier, Harald, Dr. In den Bannzaeunen 17 W-6701 Goennheim / DE | [1992/25] | Application number, filing date | 91120612.6 | 29.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | DE19904039437 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039437 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490197 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09B57/00, G11B7/24, C07C253/30 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C09B57/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/25] | Title | German: | Azulenquadratsäurefarbstoffe | [1992/25] | English: | Azulensquaric acid dyes | [1992/25] | French: | Colorants d'acide azulène squarique | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0310080 | [A] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE. Bd. 100, Nr. 2, 1967WEINHEIM DE Seiten 375 - 382; SCHOLZ ET AL: 'Ueber die Darstellung des 4-Styryl-azulens .....' |