EP0491223 - Linear guide with screw actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NADELLA-Wälzlager GmbH Tränkestrasse 7 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | [1992/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Robert G. Blankensteinstrasse 1 W-7127 Pleidelsheim / DE | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120725.6 | 03.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | DE19900017035U | 18.12.1990 Original published format: DE 9017035 U | [1992/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491223 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/20, F16H25/24 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
F16H25/2266 (EP);
B23Q11/085 (EP);
B23Q5/404 (EP);
F16C29/045 (EP);
F16H25/2418 (EP);
F16C2322/39 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/26] | Title | German: | Linearführung mit Spindelantrieb | [1992/26] | English: | Linear guide with screw actuator | [1992/26] | French: | Guidage linéaire à entrainement par vis sans fin | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1259675 (CINCINNATI MILLING MACHINE CO); | [Y]FR2479936 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]EP0086885 (PROMA PROD & MARKETING GMBH [DE]); | [X]FR2104490 (GILGEN JAKOB); | [X]DE2550743 (IBM); | [Y]JPS6110158 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10no. 155 (M-485)4. Juni 1986 & JP-A-61 010 158 ( NTN TOYO BEARING ) 17. Januar 1986 |