EP0489426 - Projection exposure method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitagawa, Tetsuya c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/24] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120850.2 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | JP19900405362 | 06.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40536290 | [1992/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0489426 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0489426 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489426 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
G03F7/70333 (EP,US);
H01L21/423 (KR);
G03F7/2022 (EP,US);
G03F7/70241 (EP,US);
G03F7/70358 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Projektionsbelichtung | [1992/24] | English: | Projection exposure method | [1992/24] | French: | Méthode d'exposition par projection | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP58017446 ; | [E]EP0484131 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]); | [AD]US4869999 (FUKUDA HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 90 (P-191)14 April 1983 & JP-A-58 017 446 ( HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K. K. ) 1 February 1983, & JP58017446 A 19830201 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 32, no. 1, June 1989, NEW YORK US pages 125 - 127; 'EXTENDED FOCAL DEPTH MICROLITHOGRAPHY' |