EP0491251 - Adsorbed monomolecular film and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashi Nakafuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 02 /
Ootake, Tadashi 30-15, Kawakitanaka-machi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP | 03 /
Soga, Mamoru 1-22, Saikudani 1-chome, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi 543 / JP | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120973.2 | 06.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | JP19900400981 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40098190 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491251 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491251 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/18, C09D4/00 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (KR);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
B05D1/185 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/26] | Title | German: | Adsorbierter monomolekularer Film und dessen Herstellung | [1992/26] | English: | Adsorbed monomolecular film and method of manufacturing the same | [1992/26] | French: | Film monomoléculaire adsorbé et procédé pour le fabriquer | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4539061 (SAGIV JACOB [IL]); | [A]EP0385656 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 26, no. 10, 10 October 1987, TOKYO JP pages 1622 - 1624; H. NAKANISHI ET AL.: 'Fabrication of polar structures by use of LB films' | [X] - ROBERTS G. 'Langmuir-Blodgett films' 1 May 1990 , PLENUM PRESS , NEW-YORK U.S. | [X] - THIN SOLID FILMS. vol. 178, no. 1, 1 November 1989, LAUSANNE CH pages 327 - 340; PALACIN S.: 'Supermolecular engineering in Langmuir-Blodgett films' | [X] - THIN SOLID FILMS. vol. 179, no. 1, 11 November 1989, LAUSANNE CH pages 429 - 432; M-A SATO ET AL.: 'Langmuir-Blodgett films of polyalkylthiophene-poly(isobutyl methacrylate) mixed polymers and their optical and electrical properties' | Examination | - G. ROBERTS, "Langmuir-Blodgett Films", 01 May 1990, Plenum Press, New York, NY (US); pp. 26-27 | - THIN SOLID FILMS, vol. 178, no. 1, 01 November 1989, Lausanne (CH); S. PALACIN, pp. 327-340 | - THIN SOLID FILMS, vol. 179, no. 1, 11 November 1989, Lausanne (CH); M.-A. SATO et al., pp. 429-432 |