EP0491260 - Wiring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach D-38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohlen, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 39a W-3171 Osloss / DE | 02 /
Starchikow, Manfred Rosenweg 8 W-3178 Calberlah / DE | [1992/26] | Application number, filing date | 91121120.9 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | DE19904040610 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4040610 | [1992/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491260 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491260 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/20, H01R31/02 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
H01R31/02 (EP,US);
H02B1/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Verkabelungsanordnung | [1992/26] | English: | Wiring device | [1992/26] | French: | Dispositif de câblage | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3927637 ; | [X]FR2617565 (KURODA GAUGE MFG [JP], et al); | [A]GB2199924 (SMC CORP); | [A]DE8709604U ; | [A]DE2558420 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN); | [A]US4971576 (THIMMESCH JAN P [US]); | [A]EP0242019 (BURNDY CORP [US]) |