EP0492274 - An asporogenous strain of bacillus subtilis and its use as a host for the preparation of heterologous products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERREL S.p.A. Strada Statale Appia 81043 Capua (Caserta) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states PIERREL S.p.A. Strada Statale Appia I-81043 Capua (Caserta) / IT | ||
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frascotti, Gianni Via E. Gignous, 11 I-20149 Milano / IT | 02 /
Cosmina, Paola Via le Misurata, 14 I-20146 Milano / IT | 03 /
Grandi, Guido Nona Strada, 4 20090 Segrate San Felice MILANO / IT | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91121211.6 | 11.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | IT19900022476 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: IT 2247690 | [1992/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0492274 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0492274 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0492274 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/75, C07K15/00, C12R1/125, C12N1/21 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12R2001/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | C12N15/75, C12N1/21, C12N15/18, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:125) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Asporogener Stamm von Bacillus substilis und seine Verwendung als Wirt in der Herstellung von heterologen Produkten | [1992/27] | English: | An asporogenous strain of bacillus subtilis and its use as a host for the preparation of heterologous products | [1992/27] | French: | Une souche de Bacillus subtilis asporogène et son utilisation comme hôte pour la préparation de produits hétérologues | [1992/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 10.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | ENIRICERCHE S.P.A. Via Maritano 26 SAN DONATO MILANESE (Milano) / IT | Date: | 28.10.1994 | [1995/05] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.11.1994 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0029497 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US]); | [A]EP0092233 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0164117 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]); | [AD]EP0321940 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY vol. 132, 1986, pages 2987 - 2994 S. CLARKE ET AL.; 'Use of lacZ gene fusions to determine the dependence pattern of the sporulation gene spoIID in spo mutants of Bacillus subtilis' |