EP0494397 - Electrical metal-clad switchboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC Alsthom T&D AG Carl-Sprecher-Strasse 1 5036 Oberentfelden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states GEC Alsthom T&D AG Carl-Sprecher-Strasse 1 CH-5036 Oberentfelden / CH | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states SPRECHER ENERGIE AG Kirchfeld 5 CH-5036 Oberentfelden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wüthrich, Hans-Rudolf Hasenweg 5 CH-5036 Oberentfelden / CH | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91121294.2 | 12.12.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | CH19910000054 | 10.01.1991 Original published format: CH 5491 | [1992/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494397 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494397 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494397 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/56 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
H02B1/56 (EP);
H01H2009/526 (EP);
H01H33/022 (EP);
H01H33/666 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1992/29] | Title | German: | Gekapseltes elektrisches Schaltfeld | [1992/29] | English: | Electrical metal-clad switchboard | [1992/29] | French: | Tableau de distribution électrique blindé | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2362798 (BOLD RALPH E); | [A]DE7141970U ; | [A]DE3617231 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XD]DE8915141U |