EP0495205 - Partition for shower with pivotable door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munch, Paul-Jean les évaux 629 F-68910 Labaroche / FR | [1992/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121331.2 | 12.12.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | DE19914101363 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101363 | [1992/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495205 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495205 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05D5/06 (EP);
E05D7/04 (EP);
A47K2003/307 (EP);
E05D5/0246 (EP);
E05Y2800/672 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/30] | Title | German: | Trennwand für Dusche mit verschwenkbarer Türe | [1992/30] | English: | Partition for shower with pivotable door | [1992/30] | French: | Ecran pour douche avec porte articulée | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.04.1995 | ES | 19.04.1995 | IT | 19.04.1995 | NL | 19.04.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/11] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
ES | 19.04.1995 | ||
IT | 19.04.1995 | ||
NL | 19.04.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
ES | 19.04.1995 | ||
IT | 19.04.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
IT | 19.04.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.04.1995 | |
IT | 19.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 19.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2549518 (TECHNAL FRANCE [FR]); | [A]DE3423037 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0187190 |