EP0490397 - Guard holograms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY P.O. Box 80028 Los Angeles, CA 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moss, Gaylord E. 4300 Via Dolce 217 Marina del Rey, California 90291 / US | 02 /
Wreede, John E. 218 Spruce Court Azusa California 91702 / US | 03 /
Yu, Kevin 4910 Goldenwest Avenue Temple City, California 91780 / US | 04 /
Scott, James E. 2026 Admore Avenue Hermosa Beach, California 90254 / US | [1992/26] |
Former [1992/25] | 01 /
Moss, Gaylord E. 4300 Via Dolce 217 Marina del Rey, California 90291 / US | ||
02 /
Wreede, John E. 1020 S. Mountain 1 Monrovia, California 91016 / US | |||
03 /
Yu, Kevin 4910 Goldenwest Avenue Temple City, California 91780 / US | |||
04 /
Scott, James E. 2026 Admore Avenue Hermosa Beach, California 90254 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121396.5 | 12.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900627783 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: US 627783 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490397 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490397 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
G02B27/0103 (EP,KR,US);
B60K35/50 (KR);
G02B2027/0109 (EP,KR,US);
G02B2027/0118 (EP,US);
G02B2027/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Schutzhologramm | [1992/25] | English: | Guard holograms | [1992/25] | French: | Hologramme de protection | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/10] | 16.10.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2149140 (GEC AVIONICS); | [X]US4737001 (MOSS GAYLORD E [US]); | [A]WO8809942 (FLIGHT DYNAMICS INC [US]) |