EP0493736 - Hose or cable reeling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Ph. Nederman & Co. Sydhamnsgatan 2 252 28 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states AB Ph. Nederman & Co. Sydhamnsgatan 2 S-252 28 Helsingborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson, Arne Tofta 1 S-28020 Bjärnum / SE | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Wagner, Karl Heinz H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 S-211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 91121493.0 | 14.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | SE19900004048 | 19.12.1990 Original published format: SE 9004048 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493736 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493736 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/44 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
B65H75/4434 (EP);
B65H75/44 (EP);
B65H75/4426 (EP);
B65H75/4478 (EP);
B65H2701/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/28] | Title | German: | Schlauch- oder Kabelaufwickelvorrichtung | [1992/28] | English: | Hose or cable reeling device | [1992/28] | French: | Dispositif d'enroulement de tuyau souple ou câble | [1992/28] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/51] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0100176 ; | [A]US4813627 |