EP0501032 - Process for the preparation of lightly-coloured alkylpolyglycosides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ripke, Norbert, Dr. Hellweg 28 W-4358 Haltern / DE | [1992/36] | Application number, filing date | 91121527.5 | 16.12.1991 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | DE19914104640 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4104640 | [1992/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0501032 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0501032 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung hellfarbener Alkylpolyglycoside | [1992/36] | English: | Process for the preparation of lightly-coloured alkylpolyglycosides | [1992/36] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'alkylpolyglycosides de couleurs claires | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 08.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0253996 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0377831 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]EP0306652 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0306651 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0306650 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0301298 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |