EP0503156 - Process of manufacture of a moulded polymer article based on a water expanded polyacrylic resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/38] | Moulded polymer article on the basis of water-expanded polymer resin | ||
[1996/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | 07.03.1997 | Correction of patent specification | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | 07.03.1997 | Change - German title | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schock & Co. GmbH Gmünder Strasse 65 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states Schock & Co. GmbH Gmünder Strasse 65 D-73614 Schorndorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Lothar Schneeberg 51 W-7067 Plüderhausen / DE | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122050.7 | 21.12.1991 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | DE19914104295 | 13.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4104295 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503156 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503156 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503156 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0503156 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/28, C08J9/12, // C08L33/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
C08J9/283 (EP,US);
C08L33/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | C08J9/28, C08J9/12, // C08L33:00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines wasserexpandierten Polyacrylatformkörpers | [1997/17] | English: | Process of manufacture of a moulded polymer article based on a water expanded polyacrylic resin | [1996/18] | French: | Procedé du manufacture d'un article moulé en matière plastique à base de resine polyacrylique expansée à l'eau | [1996/18] |
Former [1992/38] | Kunststofformkörper aus wasserexpandiertem Polymerharz | ||
Former [1992/38] | Moulded polymer article on the basis of water-expanded polymer resin | ||
Former [1992/38] | Article moulé en matière plastique à base de résine polymère expansée à l'eau | Examination procedure | 14.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2254583 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [Y]BE643164 (BAYER AG); | [Y]DE1569541 (WILL DR MED GUENTHER) |