EP0493792 - Method of manufacturing drive plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUBOTA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 6-1, Nakano 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states KUBOTA IRON WORKS CO., LTD. 6-1, Nakano 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanaka, Shigeaki 9-7, Funakoshi 2-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Steinmeister, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122230.5 | 24.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | JP19900415666 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41566690 | JP19910169009 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16900991 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493792 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493792 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/28 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
B21D53/28 (EP,US);
B21H5/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49467 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49474 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Antriebsplatten | [1992/28] | English: | Method of manufacturing drive plate | [1992/28] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de roues dentées d'entrainement | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2654944 (JACK WILSON); | [Y]FR2282303 (SIEGWART EMIL [DE]); | [A]GB2045665 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]FR2524354 (MARCHAL EQUIP AUTO [FR]); | [Y]DE3715392 (GROB ERNST FA [CH]) |