EP0548407 - Tungsten chemical vapor deposition method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMALL POWER COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS RESEARCH LABORATORIES CO., LTD. Mubanchi, Kawauchi, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states SMALL POWER COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS RESEARCH LABORATORIES CO., LTD. Mubanchi, Kawauchi, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirano, Kiichi, Small Power Communication Systems Research Lab., Co., Ltd., Mubanchi, Kawauchi Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Nobuo, Small Power Communication Systems Research Lab., Co., Ltd., Mubanchi, Kawauchi Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122326.1 | 27.12.1991 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548407 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548407 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/14, C23C16/52, H01L21/285, C23C16/08 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C23C16/14 (EP);
C23C16/52 (EP);
H01L21/28562 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1993/26] | Title | German: | CVD-Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wolfram | [1993/26] | English: | Tungsten chemical vapor deposition method | [1993/26] | French: | Méthode de dépôt chimique en phase vapeur de tungstene | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/12] | FR | 14.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4823291 ; | [A]EP0252667 | [Y] - A. NISHIYAMA ET AL '1988 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI TECHNOLOGY' 10 May 1988 , THE IEEE ELECTRON DEVICES SOCIETY , SAN DIEGO, USA | [Y] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY vol. 28, no. 12, 1 December 1985, NEW YORK, USA pages 51 - 59; E.K. BROADBENT ET AL.: 'SELECTIVE TUNGSTEN PROCESSING BY LOW PRESSURE CVD' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 138, no. 3, 1 March 1991, MANCHESTER, NH, USA pages 783 - 788; J. HOLLEMAN ET AL.: 'A REFLECTOMETRIC STUDY OF THE REACTION BETWEEN SI AND WF6 DURING W-LPCVD ON SI AND OF THE RENUCLEATION DURING THE H2 REDUCTION OF WF6' |