EP0441419 - Fibre optic assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiLiello, Laura K. 4206 Aleesa Dr. Warren, Ohio 44484 / US | 02 /
Miller, Gregory D. 565 Fairfield NE Warren, Ohio 44483 / US | 03 /
Steele, Robert E. 312 Greenbriar Dr. Cortland, Ohio 44410 / US | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1991/33] | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91200068.4 | 15.01.1991 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | US19900475569 | 06.02.1990 Original published format: US 475569 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0441419 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0441419 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441419 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28, G02B6/14 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G02B6/2808 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/33] | G02B6/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/33] | Title | German: | Faseroptische Anordnung | [1991/33] | English: | Fibre optic assembly | [1991/33] | French: | Assemblage de fibre optique | [1991/33] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 20.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.03.1996 | Appeal received No. T0468/96 | 10.05.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.09.1996 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1996/38] | 21.12.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/51] | 24.01.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57054913 ; | JP59204022 [ ]; | [Y]US4184740 (D AURIA LUIGI [FR], et al); | [Y]US4212512 (HODGE MALCOLM H [US]); | [AD]US4213670 (GIALLORENZI THOMAS G [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 129 (P-128)(1007) 15 July 1982 & JP-A-57 054 913 ( FUJITSU ), & JP57054913 A 19820715 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 72 (P-345)(1795) 2 April 1985 & JP-A-59 204 022 ( MATSUSHITA DENKI ), & JP59204022 A 19850402 |