EP0443653 - Method for the preparation of a fermented milk product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEDERLANDS INSTITUUT VOOR ZUIVELONDERZOEK Kernhemseweg 2 6718 ZB Ede / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states NEDERLANDS INSTITUUT VOOR ZUIVELONDERZOEK Kernhemseweg 2 NL-6718 ZB Ede / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaver, Franciscus Adrianus Maria Jan Steenlaan 95 NL-6717 TB Ede (Gld.) / NL | 02 /
Stadhouders, Jacobus J. Mendellaan 8 NL-6721 BD Bennekom / NL | 03 /
Kingma, Fedde Jan Lievensstraat 34 NL-6717 SP Ede (Gld.) / NL | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200239.1 | 05.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | NL19900000422 | 21.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000422 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443653 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443653 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
A23C9/1236 (EP,US);
A23C9/123 (EP,US);
A23C9/1234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, NL [1991/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gesäuertem Milchprodukt | [1991/35] | English: | Method for the preparation of a fermented milk product | [1991/35] | French: | Méthode de préparation d'un produit laitier fermenté | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2197521 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [Y]US3985901 (GONZALEZ BARBERAN CARLOS) | [X] - JOURNAL OF FOOD PROTECTION vol. 40, no. 6, June 1977, Madison, Wisconsin, US & al.: "Lactic acid production by Streptococcus lactis and Streptococcus cremorisin milk precultured with psychrotropic bacteria" | [YD] - NETHERLAND MILK AND DAIRY JOURNAL vol. 22, 1968, Amsterdam, NL & al.: "Symbiosis in yoghurt (I). Stimulation of Lactobacillus bulgaricus by afactor produced by Streptococcus thermophilus" | [Y] - NETHERLAND MILK AND DAIRY JOURNAL vol. 4, 1950, Amsterdam, NL & al.: "Yoghurt: II. Groeifactoren voor Streptococcus thermophilus" |