EP0432145 - Magnetic disc device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mihara, Takahisa 5-6-1-106, Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228 / JP | 02 /
Samma, Shoji c/o Fujitsu Ltd. 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Saito, Sigeo 2-19-13 Kyuden, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157 / JP | [1991/31] |
Former [1991/24] | 01 /
Mihara, Takahisa 5-6-1-106, Kamitsuruma Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228 / JP | ||
02 /
Samma, Shoji 3-15-13, Hiyoshi, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | |||
03 /
Saito, Sigeo 4-18-206, Minamidai 1-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228 / JP | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91200324.1 | 03.06.1987 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19860085144U | 04.06.1986 Original published format: JP 8514486 U | JP19860109459U | 18.07.1986 Original published format: JP 10945986 U | JP19860110030U | 19.07.1986 Original published format: JP 11003086 U | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0432145 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0432145 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432145 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G11B33/121 (EP,US);
G11B19/20 (KR);
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B5/4853 (EP,US);
G11B5/486 (EP,US);
G11B5/4886 (EP,US);
G11B5/5521 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/24] | Title | German: | Magnet-Scheibengerät | [1991/24] | English: | Magnetic disc device | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif à disque magnétique | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87304907.6 / EP0248650 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.06.1994 | [1995/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4164766 (BARROWS ROBERT E [US], et al) |