EP0444755 - Bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GLACIER METAL COMPANY LIMITED Argyle House Joel Street Northwood Hills Middlesex HA6 1LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states THE GLACIER METAL COMPANY LIMITED Argyle House Joel Street Northwood Hills Middlesex HA6 1LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bryden, Donald J. S. 5 Cunninghamwatt Road Stewarton / GB | 02 /
Work, Peter T. Orcadia South Hamilton Place, Kilmarnock / GB | 03 /
Mair, H. 24 Mackinlay Place Kilmarnock / GB | 04 /
McCulloch, Roy K. 15 Dipple Court Kilbirnie, Ayrshire KA25 7DR / GB | 05 /
Ross, Hugh M. 16 Simons Crescent Kilmarnock KA1 4UU / GB | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Goddard, David John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [1995/41] | Goddard, David John, et al HARRISON GODDARD FOOTE 1 Cottage Road Leeds LS6 4DD / GB | ||
Former [1991/36] | Goddard, David John T&N plc, Bowdon House Ashburton Road West Trafford Park Manchester, M17 1RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91200410.8 | 26.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | GB19900004717 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9004717 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444755 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444755 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444755 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/06, F16C33/08 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
F16C43/02 (EP,US);
F16C17/10 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/36] | F16C33/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, IT [1991/36] | Title | German: | Lager | [1991/36] | English: | Bearings | [1991/36] | French: | Paliers | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2300254 (GLACIER METAL CO LTD [GB]); | [X]EP0195474 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US]); | [A]GB2196704 (AE PLC) |