EP0445873 - Hybrid propulsion system for vehicles, in particular for road vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIAGGIO VEICOLI EUROPEI S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 23 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states PIAGGIO VEICOLI EUROPEI S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 23 I-56025 Pontedera Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masut, Lucio Via Valdinievole 173 I-56031 Bientina, Pisa / IT | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91200437.1 | 01.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | IT19900019621 | 08.03.1990 Original published format: IT 1962190 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445873 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445873 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/02 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
B60K6/36 (EP);
B60K6/383 (EP);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/543 (EP);
B60Y2200/12 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB [1991/37] | Title | German: | Hybrides Antriebssystem für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere Strassenfahrzeuge | [1991/37] | English: | Hybrid propulsion system for vehicles, in particular for road vehicles | [1991/37] | French: | Système hybride de propulsion pour véhicules, notamment véhicules routiers | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB993185 (PAPST HERMANN); | [X]GB1440484 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [X]GB2013149 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [X]EP0082932 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]); | [X]US4405029 (HUNT HUGH S [US]); | [X]US4469187 (HAGIN FAUST [DE], et al) | Examination | EP0119793 |