EP0445879 - Broadband signal amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stessen, Jeroen Hubert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Kooiman, Josephus Johannes Antonius, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200449.6 | 04.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | NL19900000518 | 07.03.1990 Original published format: NL 9000518 | [1991/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445879 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445879 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/48, H03F1/08, H03F3/45 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
H03F1/48 (EP,US);
H03F3/00 (KR);
H03F1/083 (EP,US);
H03F3/45071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/37] | Title | German: | Breitband-Signalverstärker | [1991/37] | English: | Broadband signal amplifier | [1991/37] | French: | Amplificateur de signaux à large bande | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0263601 (COMLINEAR CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0353742 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]FR1499192 (THEMARCONI COMPANY LTD); | [A]EP0240247 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]); | [A]FR2269236 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0227323 (COMLINEAR CORP [US]) | Examination | - Electronics and wireless world april 1986, pages 28 - 32, B. Wilson: " Using current conveyors " |