EP0448171 - Photocoupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS ET SEMICONDUCTEURS 4, rue du Port-aux-Vins 92150 Suresnes / FR | For:DE
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS ET SEMICONDUCTEURS 4, rue du Port-aux-Vins F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1993/27] | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS 4, rue du Port aux Vins F-92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1991/39] | For:FR
PHILIPS COMPOSANTS 117, quai du Président Roosevelt F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thillays, Jacques Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/39] | Jacquard, Philippe Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91200605.3 | 20.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | FR19900003735 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: FR 9003735 | [1991/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448171 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/167 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
H01L31/167 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/39] | Title | German: | Photokoppler | [1991/39] | English: | Photocoupler | [1991/39] | French: | Photocoupleur | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 16.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5987880 ; | [A]EP0103032 ; | [AD]FR2262407 ; | [A]US4047045 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 200 (E-266)(1637) 13 septembre 1984, & JP-A-59 87880 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 21 mai 1984,, & JP5987880 A 00000000 |