EP0451892 - Ball-cock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEFIT INDUSTRIAL B.V. Zweedsestraat 1 NL-7418 BB DEVENTER / NL | [1994/03] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states NEFIT FASTO B.V. Zweedsestraat 1 NL-7418 BB Deventer / NL | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states Nederlandse Industriele Maatschappij NEFIT B.V. 1 Zweedsestraat NL-7418 BB Deventer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottens, Jan 124, Ceintuurbaan NL-7415 AP Deventer / NL | 02 /
Lodder, Bernhard 29, Baalder Esch NL-7772 JW Hardenberg / NL | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | van der Kloet-Dorleijn, G.W.F., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | van der Kloet-Dorleijn, G.W.F., et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1994/03] | van der Kloet-Dorleijn, Geertruida W.F., Drs., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1991/42] | Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200651.7 | 22.03.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | NL19900000772 | 02.04.1990 Original published format: NL 9000772 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451892 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451892 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
F16K5/0626 (EP,US);
F16K5/06 (KR);
F16K27/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Kugelventil | [1991/42] | English: | Ball-cock | [1991/42] | French: | Robinet sphérique | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.10.1993 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1450917 (SAUNDERS VALVE CO LTD); | [A]US4023773 (WISE EUGENE H); | [A]CH637743 (EGGERT UWE [SE]); | [A]US4497344 (KISIEL STANLEY C [US]); | [A]GB2164425 (BRYAN DONKIN CO LTD); | [A]EP0297382 (SIRIO SPA [IT]) | Examination | EP0051214 |