EP0449368 - Method for compiling computer instructions for increasing cache efficiency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Rajiv, c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Chi, Chi-Hung, c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | de Haas, Laurens Johan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | de Haas, Laurens Johan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1991/40] | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200655.8 | 25.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | US19900500627 | 27.03.1990 Original published format: US 500627 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0449368 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0449368 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449368 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/44 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
G06F8/4442 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/40] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kompilierung von Rechnerbefehlen, um Cachespeicherleistung zu verbessern | [1991/40] | English: | Method for compiling computer instructions for increasing cache efficiency | [1991/40] | French: | Procédé pour compiler les instructions d'ordinateur pour améliorer l'efficacité d'une antémémoire | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.08.1998 | [2008/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4200927 (HUGHES JEFFREY F [US], et al); | [A]EP0207665 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]EP0323140 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |