EP0453017 - Occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Gregory Allen 293 Randall Drive Troy MI 48098 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Denton, Michael John, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1992/27] | Haines, Arthur Donald Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | ||
Former [1991/43] | Haines, Arthur Donald Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91200745.7 | 29.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900511363 | 19.04.1990 Original published format: US 511363 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453017 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453017 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
B60R21/2035 (EP,US);
B60R21/26 (EP,US);
B60R21/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/43] | Title | German: | Insassen-Rückhaltesystem | [1991/43] | English: | Occupant restraint system | [1991/43] | French: | Système de retenue pour occupants | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4902036 (ZANDER RONALD [US], et al); | [APD]EP0370613 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [A]US4178017 (ISHI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4913461 (CUEVAS JESS [US]); | [A]DE3707370 (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG [DE]); | [A]DE3910337 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]GB2192841 (TRW REPA GMBH) |