EP0453033 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Wilbert Jozef Antoon Marie c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
van Haren, Johannes Albertus Matthijs Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Verhulst, Antonius Gerardus Hendrikus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200875.2 | 15.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | NL19900000942 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: NL 9000942 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453033 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453033 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1343, G09G3/36 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G02F1/134336 (EP,US);
G09G3/3607 (EP,US);
G02F1/134345 (EP,US);
G09G3/2074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Wiedergabeanordnung | [1991/43] | English: | Display device | [1991/43] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.12.1995 | NL | 06.12.1995 | SE | 06.03.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | IT | 06.12.1995 | |
NL | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 06.12.1995 | |
SE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 06.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0361981 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]FR2637407 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |