EP0463652 - Biomechanical body support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REVAB B.V. P.O. Box 11 NL-7064 ZG Silvolde / NL | [1992/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beumer, Anton Hendrik Dinxperloseweg 62 A Silvolde / NL | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201038.6 | 01.05.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | NL19900001053 | 02.05.1990 Original published format: NL 9001053 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463652 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/00, A61G5/12, A47C1/022 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
A61G5/1067 (EP,US);
A61G5/006 (EP,US);
A61G5/12 (EP,US);
A61G5/121 (EP,US);
A61G5/125 (EP,US);
A61G5/128 (EP,US);
A61G2203/74 (EP,US);
A61G5/045 (EP,US);
A61G5/107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Biomechanische Körperunterstützung | [1992/01] | English: | Biomechanical body support | [1992/01] | French: | Support biomécanique pour un corps | [1992/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/28] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4339013 (WEIGT GERALD I); | [A]US2558171 (CHESLEY GEORGE B); | [AD]DE1957744 (E QUETIN ETS); | [A]DE2628033 (PFENNIGPARADE E V); | [AD]US3934929 (RABINOWITZ AZRIEL JAY); | [A]WO7900647 (TOOSBUY K [DK], et al); | [A]DE2524568 (SENGLER DIETER DIPL ING) |