EP0456317 - Catalyst compositions and polymerization process, hexakisphosphines and hexahalo compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keijsper, Johannes Jacobus Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
van Leeuwen, Petrus Wilhelmus Nicolaas Maria Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
van der Made, Alexander Willem Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/01] |
Former [1991/46] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201062.6 | 03.05.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | NL19900001114 | 10.05.1990 Original published format: NL 9001114 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456317 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456317 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/24, C08G67/02 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
C08G67/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/00 (KR);
B01J31/064 (EP,US);
B01J31/1683 (EP,US);
B01J31/24 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
C07C43/174 (EP,US);
C07F15/0013 (EP,US);
C07F15/0066 (EP,US);
C07F9/5027 (EP,US);
B01J2231/10 (EP,US);
B01J2531/0258 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/46] | Title | German: | Katalytische Zusammensetzungen und Polymerisationsverfahren, Hexakiphosphin- und Hexahalid-Verbindungen | [1991/46] | English: | Catalyst compositions and polymerization process, hexakisphosphines and hexahalo compounds | [1991/46] | French: | Compositions catalytiques et procédé de polymérisation, hexakisphosphines et composés hexalhalogénés | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0380162 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4183825 (CARLOCK JOHN T [US]) |