EP0458385 - Wholly digital process for the generation of multi-level modulation signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italtel S.p.a. Via Alessio di Tocqueville, 13 20154 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Italtel s.p.a. Piazzale Zavattari, 12 20149 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS TELECOMUNICAZIONI S.P.A. SS. 11 Padana Superiore Km. 158 I-20060 Cassina de Pecchi (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lo Curto, Michelangelo Via Virgilio, 4 I-20038 Seregno (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Salerno, Marcello Via Bosatra, 12 I-20064 Gorgonzola, (Milano) / IT | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/40] |
Former [1991/48] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91201116.0 | 10.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | IT19900020380 | 18.05.1990 Original published format: IT 2038090 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458385 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458385 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458385 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
H04L27/365 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/48] | H04L27/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Rein digitales Verfahren zur Erzeugung mehrstufiger Modulationssignale | [1997/30] | English: | Wholly digital process for the generation of multi-level modulation signals | [1991/48] | French: | Procédé entièrement numérique pour la génération de signaux d'une modulation à plusieurs niveaux | [1991/48] |
Former [1991/48] | Rein digitalisches Verfahren zur Erzeugung mehrstufiger Modulationssignale | Examination procedure | 04.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.07.1997 | ES | 23.07.1997 | FR | 23.07.1997 | GR | 23.07.1997 | IT | 23.07.1997 | LI | 23.07.1997 | SE | 23.10.1997 | DE | 24.10.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | CH | 23.07.1997 | |
ES | 23.07.1997 | ||
GR | 23.07.1997 | ||
IT | 23.07.1997 | ||
LI | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.10.1997 | ||
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | CH | 23.07.1997 | |
GR | 23.07.1997 | ||
IT | 23.07.1997 | ||
LI | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.10.1997 | ||
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 23.07.1997 | |
IT | 23.07.1997 | ||
LI | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.10.1997 | ||
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | CH | 23.07.1997 | |
LI | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.10.1997 | ||
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | SE | 23.10.1997 | |
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
FR | 19.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 23.10.1997 | |
DE | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 23.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8603356 (DEVON COUNTY COUNCIL [GB], et al); | [A]EP0194903 (FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR [US]); | [A]EP0194791 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]); | [Y]US4626803 (HOLM JOHN R [US]); | [Y]US4680556 (NAKAMURA SHIGEKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0258584 (HAYES MICROCOMPUTER PROD [US]) |