EP0462670 - Use of 1-(1-pyrrolidinylcarbonyl)pyridinium salts to attach compounds to caboxylated particles & a kit containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states CLINICAL DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS, INC. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Danielson, Susan Jean, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Specht, Donald Paul, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1991/52] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 91201498.2 | 14.06.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | US19900539680 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: US 539680 | [1991/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462670 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462670 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/547, G01N33/545, G01N33/543, G01N33/546, C12N11/08 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/54353 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/128 (KR);
C12N11/089 (EP,US);
C12N11/082 (EP,KR,US);
C12N11/087 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/545 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 1-(1-Pyrrolidinylcarbonyl)pyridiniumsalzen zur Ankoppelung von Verbindungen an carboxylierte Teilchen und Reagenziensatz diese beinhaltend | [1991/52] | English: | Use of 1-(1-pyrrolidinylcarbonyl)pyridinium salts to attach compounds to caboxylated particles & a kit containing same | [1991/52] | French: | Usage de sels 1-(1-pyrrolidinylcarbonyl)pyridinium pour l'attachement des combinaisons à particules carboxylées et trousse les contenant | [1991/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0138297 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [AD]EP0308235 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |