EP0464898 - An optical data processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shannon, John Martin c/o Philips Research Laboratories Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Brian Thomas, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1995/10] |
Former [1992/02] | Clark, Jane Anne Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91201558.3 | 19.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | GB19900014504 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: GB 9014504 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464898 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464898 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464898 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06E1/02, G06E3/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G02F3/00 (EP,US);
G06E1/02 (EP,US);
G02F1/1347 (EP,US);
G02F1/1362 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | G06E1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Optisches Datenverarbeitungsgerät | [1992/02] | English: | An optical data processing device | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif optique de traitement de données | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8605607 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]EP0109832 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [A] - ICASSP 88, New York, pp812-815, XP92957; Wang et al: 'Pyramid Transform Coding Using Vector Quantization' | [A] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING vol. 22, no. 5, October 1983, BELLINGHAM US pages SR-146 - SR-153 STERMER ET AL 'Optical Data Processing for Aerospace Applications' | [A] - MASASHI HASHIMOTO, KEN-ICHI KITAYAMA, NAOHISA MUKOHZAKA., "PROGRAMMABLE OPTICAL PARALLEL PROCESSOR BASED UPON POLARIZATION MODULATION: CASCADE OPERATIONS.", Applied Optics, Optical Society of America, WASHINGTON, DC; US, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19891015), vol. 28., no. 20., ISSN 0003-6935, pages 4305 - 4312., XP000071267 |