EP0464912 - Electro-optical scanning device and optical player comprising the scanning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homburg, Fredericus Gerardus Antonius c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Stinesen, Bernardus Johannes c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Compter, Johan Cornelis c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Heymans, Peter Michel Silvester Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert J.M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Schrijnemaekers, Hubert Joannes Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201587.2 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | NL19900001492 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: NL 9001492 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464912 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464912 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/08 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Elektrooptische Abtasteinrichtung sowie mit der Abtasteinrichtung versehener optischer Spieler | [1992/02] | English: | Electro-optical scanning device and optical player comprising the scanning device | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif de balayage électro-optique et lecteur optique muni d'un tel dispositif de balayage | [1996/20] |
Former [1992/02] | Dispositif de balayer électro-optique ainsi que lecteur optique muni du dispositif de balayage | Examination procedure | 07.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0343979 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0112595 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [XP]WO9101549 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4878214 (HINOTANI HIROAKI [JP]); | [A]US4752117 (ICHIKAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0359670 |