EP0466237 - Stabilized emulsion systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 1411 GP Naarden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states QUEST INTERNATIONAL B.V. Huizerstraatweg 28 NL-1411 GP Naarden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behan, John Martin Shermel, Ball Lane, Kennington Ashford, Kent / GB | 02 /
Ness, Jeremy Nicholas 22 River Court, Chartham Canterbury, Kent, CT4 7JN / GB | 03 /
Perring, Keith Douglas 41 Balmore Park, Ashford Kent / GB | 04 /
Smith, William Mervyn 10 Walton Manor Close Folkstone, Kent, CT19 5QG / GB | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Dekker, Enno Ernst Jan, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Dekker, Enno E.J., et al Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1992/03] | Hartong, Richard Leroy, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201646.6 | 27.06.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | EP19900307586 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: EP 90307586 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466237 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466237 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, C11D3/00 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C11D17/0026 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
Y10S516/01 (EP,US);
Y10S516/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | Stabilisiertes Emulsionssystem | [1992/03] | English: | Stabilized emulsion systems | [1992/03] | French: | Systèmes d'émulsion stabilisés | [1992/03] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1994
05.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TTP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
21.12.1994
02.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE E.T.C. Temselaan, 100 B-1820 Strombeck-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1994
05.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TTP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
21.12.1994
02.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE E.T.C. Temselaan, 100 B-1820 Strombeck-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Engisch, Gautier Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02.02.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.10.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.1994 | DK | 23.03.1994 | IT | 23.03.1994 | SE | 23.03.1994 | ES | 24.06.1994 | GR | 24.06.1994 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 23.03.1994 | |
DK | 23.03.1994 | ||
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
SE | 23.03.1994 | ||
ES | 24.06.1994 | ||
Former [2003/13] | AT | 23.03.1994 | |
DK | 23.03.1994 | ||
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
SE | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 23.03.1994 | |
CH | 23.03.1994 | ||
DK | 23.03.1994 | ||
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
LI | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.03.1994 | |
DK | 23.03.1994 | ||
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 23.03.1994 | |
DK | 23.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 23.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60184003 ; | [Y]JP53079043 ; | [Y]JP01019004 ; | [YD]EP0368146 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [Y]EP0217105 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]GB1439244 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 2, 13th January 1986, page 302, abstract no. 10406s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 184 003 (LION CORP.) 19-09-1985, & JP60184003 A 00000000 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI(L), AN=78-59474A [33], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-53 079 043 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU) 13-07-1978, & JP53079043 A 00000000 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI(L), AN=89-066015 [09], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-01 019 004 (Y. MORIMOTO) 23-01-1989, & JP01019004 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0451889 |