EP0464958 - System and process for continuous determination of paper strength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEASUREX CORPORATION One Results Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chase, Lee Mac 14800 Quito Road Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Legendre, Gérard, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Legendre, Gérard, et al Société de Protection des Inventions, 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/02] | Mongrédien, André c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91202007.0 | 04.10.1988 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19870106828 | 05.10.1987 Original published format: US 106828 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464958 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464958 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/34, G01N3/08 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
G01N3/08 (EP,US);
G01N33/34 (KR);
G01N33/346 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0278 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur kontinuierlichen Bestimmung der Papierfestigkeit | [1992/02] | English: | System and process for continuous determination of paper strength | [1992/02] | French: | Système et procédé pour la détermination en continue de la résistance du papier | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88402506.5 / EP0311507 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.12.1995 | IT | 27.12.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 27.12.1995 | |
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.12.1995 | |
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | FR | 24.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2170905 (CHAMPION INT CORP); | [Y]EP0200650 (MEASUREX CORP [US]); | [A]US2215329 (LESSMANN GERHARD P); | [A]US3461030 (KEYES MARION A) |