EP0473219 - Pickup tine guard mounting arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND INC. 500 Diller Avenue P.O. Box 1895 New Holland Pennsylvania 17557-0903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bich, G. L. 168 Skyline Drive New Holland, PA 17557 / US | 02 /
Thomas, L. R. 141 Edgewood Drive New Holland, PA 17557 / US | 03 /
Boucquez, W. J. Jagersstraat, 55 B-8200 Brugge / BE | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1992/10] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic T.J. New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 91202050.0 | 12.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | US19900574024 | 29.08.1990 Original published format: US 574024 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473219 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473219 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01D89/00 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
A01D89/002 (EP,US);
Y10S56/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/10] | Title | German: | Einbauanordnung der Führungsbleche eines Aufsammelgerätes | [1992/10] | English: | Pickup tine guard mounting arrangement | [1992/10] | French: | Dispositif de montage des tôles de garde d'un ramasseur | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3713283 (FRITZ E); | [A]US4161859 (RIDGE GEORGE W [US], et al); | [A]DE3315033 (HERMANN LOHMANN MASCHINENFABRI [DE]); | [A]US3613345 (COFER LARRY WILSON); | [A]US3226921 (SHEPLEY JOHN H); | [AD]US3397527 (LUEK OTTO W, et al) | by applicant | US3397527 |