EP0474310 - Method for the production of a steel plate concrete floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSCHE BETON GROEP N.V. 489, Generaal Spoorlaan 2285 TA Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states HOLLANDSCHE BETON GROEP N.V. 489, Generaal Spoorlaan NL-2285 TA Rijswijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Sitter, Wolter R. Mecklenburglaan 43 NL-1404 BG Bussum / NL | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202275.3 | 05.09.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | NL19900001970 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: NL 9001970 | [1992/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474310 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474310 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/40 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
E04B5/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, LU, NL [1992/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Stahlblechbetondecke | [1992/11] | English: | Method for the production of a steel plate concrete floor | [1992/11] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un plancher en béton et tôle d'acier | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4809474 ; | [X]WO8801330 ; | [X]US3712010 ; | [X]US3862479 ; | [Y]FR2233464 ; | [Y]NL7013151 ; | [A]US4709456 |