EP0479352 - Converter for discharge lamps with dimming means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smits, Egbertus Hendricus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Marie, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202303.3 | 10.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | NL19900002023 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: NL 9002023 | [1992/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479352 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479352 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/392 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
H05B41/3925 (EP,US);
H05B41/14 (KR);
H05B41/2827 (EP,US);
Y10S315/04 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/15] | Title | German: | Dimbares Vorschaltgerät für Entladungslampen | [1992/15] | English: | Converter for discharge lamps with dimming means | [1992/15] | French: | Convertisseur pour lampes à décharge avec possibilités de variation d'intensité lumineuse | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0294878 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0075176 (HELVAR OY [FI]); | [A]EP0189221 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]EP0340049 (APPLIC ET UTILISATIONS DES PRO [FR]) |