EP0479357 - Power supply device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 7550 GD Hengelo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 NL-7550 GD Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Mark, Jacobus Pottenbakkersdonk 424 NL-7326 PE Apeldoorn / NL | [1992/15] | Application number, filing date | 91202329.8 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | NL19900002148 | 03.10.1990 Original published format: NL 9002148 | [1992/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479357 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479357 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01F19/08 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G01S7/282 (EP,US);
H01F19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/37] |
Former [1992/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsanordnung | [1992/15] | English: | Power supply device | [1992/15] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation électrique | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2549366 (BOSTICK WINSTON H); | [A]US3514566 (IRONFIELD RICHARD); | [A]DE2529296 (FERRANTI LTD) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS. vol. MAG-7, no. 1, March 1971, NEW YORK US pages 17 - 28; HAROLD W. LORD: 'pulse transformers' | Examination | - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS. vol. MAG-7, no. 1, March 1971, NEW YORK US pages 17 - 28; HAROLD W. LORD: 'pulse transformers' page 21, right columnmn, last paragraph; figure 7 |