EP0476765 - Hydrogenation catalyst consisting of a particle-bearing composite and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/13] | A particle-bearing composite and a method for producing the same | ||
[1997/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAISO CO., LTD. 10-8, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states DAISO CO., LTD. 10-8, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Hidefumi 14-8, Kamiishihara 1-chome Choufu-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Hironobu 40-2, Shimoishihara 2-chome Choufu-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/13] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202343.9 | 11.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | JP19900239035 | 11.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23903590 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476765 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476765 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J23/50 (EP,US);
B01J31/06 (EP,US);
B01J33/00 (EP,US);
B01J35/33 (EP,US);
B01J37/0221 (EP,US);
B01J2231/643 (EP,US);
B01J2231/645 (EP,US);
B01J23/48 (EP,US);
B01J35/393 (EP,US);
Y10S526/908 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Hydrierkatalysator bestehend aus einer Teilchen enthaltenden Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1997/23] | English: | Hydrogenation catalyst consisting of a particle-bearing composite and method for producing the same | [1997/23] | French: | Catalyseur d'hydrogénation basé sur une composition contenant des particules et méthode de préparation dudit catalyseur | [1997/23] |
Former [1992/13] | Teilchen enthaltende Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1992/13] | A particle-bearing composite and a method for producing the same | ||
Former [1992/13] | Composition contenant des particules et une méthode de préparation de la dite composition | Examination procedure | 11.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.02.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2531769 (DEGUSSA); | [A]EP0023102 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [X]US4252677 (SMITH THOMAS W) | Examination | US2397744 | EP0252254 | - JOURNAL OF MACROMOLECULAR SCIENCE, vol. A13, no. 5, 1979; pp. 631-649 | - JOURNAL OF COLLOID & INTERFACE SCIENCE, vol. 131, no. 1, 1989; pp. 186-191 |