EP0478074 - Alkoxylation of carboxylated compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Stephen Wayne 120 Teays Meadows Scott Depot, West Virginia 25560 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/14] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202422.1 | 19.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900585459 | 20.09.1990 Original published format: US 585459 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478074 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478074 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07B41/04, // C07C69/12, C07C69/96, C07C269/06, C07D295/205, C07C67/26, C07C68/06 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
C07D295/205 (EP,US);
C07B41/04 (EP,US);
C07B41/08 (EP,US);
C07C269/06 (EP,US);
C07C67/26 (EP,US);
C07C68/06 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/26, C07C69/14 (US,EP);
C07C67/26, C07C69/24 (US,EP);
C07C68/06, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | C07B41/04, // (C07C69/12, 69:96, 219:06) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Alkoxylierung von carboxylierten Verbindungen | [1992/14] | English: | Alkoxylation of carboxylated compounds | [1992/14] | French: | Alkoxylation de composés carboxyles | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/31] | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP8136431 ; | [XD]EP0339426 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [XP]WO9013533 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [E]WO9115441 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 11, 14th September 1981, page 590, abstract no. 97099m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-81 36 431 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INC.) 09-04-1981, & JP8136431 A 00000000 |