EP0473241 - Automated initiation of timing of reflectance readings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/10] | Method of operation of reflectance-reading devices | ||
[1998/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states LIFESCAN, INC. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | ||
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states LIFESCAN, INC. 1443 Wyandotte Street Mountain View California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, Roger 845 Richardson Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
McGarraugh, Geoffrey 291 Hacienda Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | 03 /
Jurik, Frank 142 16th Avenue San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
Underwood, Ray 146005 Paynes Creek Road Red Bluff, CA 96080 / US | [1998/43] |
Former [1992/10] | 01 /
Philipps, Roger 845 Richardson Court Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
02 /
McGarraugh, Geoffrey 291 Hacienda Drive Scotts Valley, California 95066 / US | |||
03 /
Jurik, Frank 142 16th Avenue San Mateo, California 94402 / US | |||
04 /
Underwood, Ray 146005 Paynes Creek Road Red Bluff, California 96080 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1995/03] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1992/10] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91203032.7 | 07.08.1987 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | US19860896418 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: US 896418 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0473241 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0473241 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473241 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, G01N21/47, G01N21/86, // C12Q1/54, C12Q1/00, G01N33/66 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G01N21/8483 (EP,US);
G01N33/00 (KR);
C12Q1/54 (EP,US);
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
G01N33/521 (EP,US);
G01N33/523 (EP,US);
G01N33/66 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4757 (EP,US);
G01N21/314 (EP,US);
G01N21/4738 (EP,US);
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US);
Y10S435/808 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | Automatisierte Auslösung des richtigen Zeitpunkts von Reflexions-Messungen | [1998/24] | English: | Automated initiation of timing of reflectance readings | [1998/24] | French: | Initiation automatisée du déclanchement de mesures de la réflexion | [1998/24] |
Former [1992/10] | Verfahren zum Betrieb von Reflexions-Messgeräten | ||
Former [1992/10] | Method of operation of reflectance-reading devices | ||
Former [1992/10] | Procédé pour l'opération d'instruments de mesure de réflexion | Examination procedure | 10.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87307014.8 / EP0256806 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Request for further processing for: | 03.10.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 03.10.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.12.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4199261 (COLLINS CARTER C [US], et al); | [X]WO8300931 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]EP0166878 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) | Examination | - Health Devices, 17(9), September 1988, 253-71 |