EP0493845 - Holder for a rectangular cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doodson, Peter John c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Weele, Paul Johannes Frits c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/28] | Van Weele, Paul Johannes Frits INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91203104.4 | 27.11.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | NL19900002653 | 04.12.1990 Original published format: NL 9002653 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493845 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493845 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493845 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/023 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
G11B23/0233 (EP);
G11B23/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/28] | Title | German: | Gehäuse für eine rechteckige Kassette | [1992/28] | English: | Holder for a rectangular cassette | [1992/28] | French: | Boîte pour cassette rectangulaire | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2000 | BE | 23.02.2000 | CH | 23.02.2000 | ES | 23.02.2000 | GR | 23.02.2000 | IT | 23.02.2000 | LI | 23.02.2000 | NL | 23.02.2000 | DK | 23.05.2000 | SE | 23.05.2000 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
ES | 23.02.2000 | ||
GR | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
NL | 23.02.2000 | ||
DK | 23.05.2000 | ||
SE | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
ES | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
NL | 23.02.2000 | ||
DK | 23.05.2000 | ||
SE | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
ES | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
NL | 23.02.2000 | ||
SE | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
ES | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
SE | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
SE | 23.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 23.02.2000 | |
BE | 23.02.2000 | ||
CH | 23.02.2000 | ||
LI | 23.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 23.02.2000 | |
LI | 23.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3912077 (KRYNICKI WITOLD); | [Y]FR2508222 (ALFA ASS INC [JP]); | [XD]FR2632759 (SALARO SA [ES]) | Examination | US2617520 | US3373862 | US3760937 | DE3229894 | DE3701371 | DE4033095 | EP0480511 | EP0480515 |