EP0489477 - Operating circuit for gas discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoeksma, Gerben Simon Bargerkempke 5 NL-7103 DK Winterswijk / NL | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/24] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91203172.1 | 05.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | NL19900002681 | 05.12.1990 Original published format: NL 9002681 | [1992/24] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489477 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP);
H05B41/2851 (EP);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/24] | Title | German: | Steuerungsschaltung für Entladungslampen | [1992/24] | English: | Operating circuit for gas discharge lamps | [1992/24] | French: | Circuit de cmmande de lampes à décharge | [1992/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/05] | 16.09.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0351012 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [Y]EP0311424 (THOMAS INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | [Y]DE3432266 (KNOBEL ELEKTRO APP [CH]); | [Y]US4874989 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]); | [A]EP0391383 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]) | [Y] - SIEMENS COMPONENTS vol. 21, no. 3, June 1986, MUNCHEN pages 103 - 107; HERFURTH: 'tda 4814-Integrated circuit for sinusoidal consumption' |