EP0491418 - Wind deflector for an open roof construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vermeulen-Hollandia Octrooien II B.V. Küppersweg 89 NL-2031 EB Haarlem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states VERMEULEN-HOLLANDIA OCTROOIEN II B.V. Küppersweg 89 NL-2031 EB Haarlem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huyer, Johannes Nicolaas Rietkamp 4 NL-1991 BN Velserbroek / NL | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O.Box 20052 NL-1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 91203203.4 | 06.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | NL19900002768 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: NL 9002768 | [1992/26] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491418 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/22 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
B60J7/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Windabweiser für Schiebedach | [1992/26] | English: | Wind deflector for an open roof construction | [1992/26] | French: | Déflecteur de vent pour toit ouvrant | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 20.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3833046 ; | [XP]EP0421115 |